Financial history CALLINGTON BOWLING CLUB

Charity number: 1106797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £28.25k £29.83k £25.24k £25.89k £27.61k
Total expenditure £19.16k £27.90k £22.73k £24.72k £29.37k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £18.24k £2.67k N/A N/A