CALLINGTON BOWLING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of comminity participation in healthy recreation by providing facilities for the playing of flat green and short mat bowling for the inhabitants of callington and district.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 16 November 2004: Standard registration
- CBC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WILLIAM ROWAN | Chair | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Michael Curthoys | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Laura Stevens | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jones | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yvette Wiltshire | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cynthia Briggs | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Wiltshire | Trustee | 01 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Roger Ellard | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Glyn Coggon | Trustee | 01 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Michael Gorman | Trustee | 01 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Redfern | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL BENGER | Trustee | 30 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
MRS DIANA JACKSON | Trustee | 30 December 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.25k | £29.83k | £25.24k | £25.89k | £27.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.16k | £27.90k | £22.73k | £24.72k | £29.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | £18.24k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 12 August 2022 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 12 August 2022 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 01 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED 14 OCTOBER 2004 AND 13 OCTOBER 2005..
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF FLAT GREEN AND SHORT MAT BOWLING FOR THE INHABITANTS OF CALLINGTON AND DISTRICT.
Area of benefit
FOR THE INHABITANTS OF CALLINGTON AND DISTRICT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 The Laurels
St. Anns Chapel
GUNNISLAKE
Cornwall
PL18 9PJ
- Phone:
- 01822833134
- Email:
- CALBOWLING@OUTLOOK.COM
- Website:
-
callingtonbowlingclub.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window