Trustees CALLINGTON BOWLING CLUB

Charity number: 1106797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILLIAM ROWAN Chair 01 October 2015
None on record
Michael Curthoys Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Laura Stevens Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Amanda Jones Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Yvette Wiltshire Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Cynthia Briggs Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
David Wiltshire Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Roger Ellard Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
Glyn Coggon Trustee 01 October 2017
None on record
Michael Gorman Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
Rosalind Redfern Trustee 01 October 2014
None on record
MICHAEL BENGER Trustee 30 December 2011
None on record
MRS DIANA JACKSON Trustee 30 December 2011
None on record