ACTION OUTREACH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Action Outreach has not undertaken any fundraising initiatives this financial year. Funds raised from the Gobi March in 2005 were received during the year and post year end were applied to fund the Operation Smile Mission in Urumqi, China where about 300 children received corrective surgery for severe facial deformities arising from birth defects and cleft palate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- China
Governance
- 08 September 2004: Standard registration
- 19 March 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2008 | 30/06/2009 | 30/06/2010 | 30/06/2011 | 30/06/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.20k | £915 | £993 | £3.23k | £5.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.25k | £556 | £816 | £3.37k | £6.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2012 | 13 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2012 | 24 October 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2011 | 09 September 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2010 | 26 October 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2010 | 28 September 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 June 2009 | 30 November 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2009 | 24 November 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND WELFARE AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND, IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING: A) TO FUND, SUPPLY, STAFF AND ORGANISE RURAL MEDICAL CLINICS AND HEALTH EDUCATION PROGRAMMES IN THE WESTERN PROVINCE OF KENYA; B) TO DEVELOP PRIMARY HEALTH CARE PROGRAMMES IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES AND C) TO SUPPORT STUDENT. YOUNG PROFESSIONAL INTERNATIONAL HEALTH INITIATIVES..
Area of benefit
OVERSEAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window