PEMBURY COMMUNITIES NURSERY INITIATIVE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PEMBURY COMMUNITY NURSERY IS A MULTI-CULTURAL NURESRY WHICH PROVIDES FULL-TIME DAY CARE AND PRE-SCHOOL EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN UNDER FIVE YEARS OF AGE WITHIN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HACKNEY. WE AIM TO PROVIDE A HIGH QUALITY OF CHILDCARE IN A SAFE, CARING AND STIMULATING ENVIRONMENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hackney
Governance
- 17 November 2004: Standard registration
- 18 September 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £351.02k | £356.39k | £281.65k | £329.87k | £318.62k | |
|
Total expenditure | £347.30k | £352.61k | £297.26k | £311.94k | £301.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 MARCH 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 3 NOVEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN (MAINLY THOSE UNDER THE AGE OF 5) AND ADULTS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A CHILD-CARE AND EDUCATIONAL CENTRE FOR THOSE WHO LIVE ON THE PEMBURY ESTATE, E5 AND IN LONDON ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") 2. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR SUCH PERSONS ABOVE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES (WHO LIVE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT) WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
FOR THOSE WHO LIVE ON THE PEMBURY ESTATE, E5 AND IN LONDON.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window