FIRST FOCUS FAKENHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our service priority is to enable people who are disadvantaged, isolated and difficult to reach in Fakenham and surrounding communities to become more involved, self-confident & self sufficient. The longer term aim is to achieve more inclusive and stronger communities through people having greater opportunities. Our service is user led and innovative. We are open to all on Tuesdays & Thursdays.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 01 November 2004: Standard registration
- FIRST FOCUS (Working name)
- FAKENHAM FOCUS (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carla Andrews | Trustee | 20 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Howard | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
AMANDA NUDDS | Trustee | 02 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
Martyn Benstead | Trustee | 09 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
HOWARD YOUNG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £82.19k | £39.96k | £59.40k | £36.06k | £55.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.11k | £56.84k | £41.99k | £50.34k | £54.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £4.69k | £5.07k | £214 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 JANUARY 2002 AS AMENDED ON 16 SEPTEMBER 2004 AND 14 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
2.1 TO HELP AND ASSIST PEOPLE IN FAKENHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS WHO ARE IN NEED BY PROVIDING SIGNPOSTING INFORMATION AND SUPPORT WHEN POSSIBLE. 2.2 TO ADVANCE LEARNING BY PROVIDING ACCESS TO TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES ON A RANGE OF APPROPRIATE SUBJECTS
Area of benefit
FAKENHAM AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Oak Street
Fakenham
Norfolk
NR21 9DY
- Phone:
- 01328 855083
- Email:
- info@firstfocus.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window