Trustees THE LOWER DARWEN MEMORIAL BOWLING ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1108086

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Dickinson | Trustee | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Harper | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Briggs | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Shirley Boothby | Trustee | 21 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Knox | Trustee | 22 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
JEAN PIMRICK | Trustee | 26 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
John Trevor SHAW | Trustee | 26 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Linda Chappell-Finlow | Trustee | 27 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
HELEN JESSICA WILLIAMSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RAYMOND ARMER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.