ECO TRUST UK
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's activities celebrate creativity and inspire environmentally-friendly living and greener lifestyles.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 November 2004: Standard registration
- 02 May 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CAI FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.02k | £2.07k | £0 | £0 | £262 | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.97k | £1.32k | £350 | £152 | £117 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 22 September 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 28 August 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 24 August 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 NOVEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY INCREASING THEIR KNOWLEDGE OF, THEIR APPRECIATION OF, AND THEIR ENGAGEMENT IN THE ARTS AND CULTURE. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY INCREASING THEIR KNOWLEDGE OF, AND AWARENESS OF, THE ENVIRONMENT AND ENVIRONMENTAL SUSTAINABILITY.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window