INSPIRE SCHOOLS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity delivers literacy, road safety and walk to school initiatives to support schools, families and children. In the Kent area it also supports the charitable sector by staging collaborative fundraising events which good causes use to boost their fundraising.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Total income includes £129,140 from 21 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 13 September 2004: Standard registration
- KENT AND MEDWAY CHARITY TEAM (Previous name)
- KENT AND MEDWAY WALKING BUS GROUP (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STUART SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Victoria Richmond | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Hayley King | Trustee | 24 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Chiana | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN PORTANIER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN VYE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £415.38k | £468.53k | £455.76k | £323.77k | £210.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £438.53k | £511.28k | £510.16k | £368.91k | £276.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £16.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £146.65k | £37.43k | N/A | £175.22k | £129.14k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | |||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 2 JUNE 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 18 OCT 2016 as amended on 18 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN, FAMILIES, THE HOMELESS AND DISADVANTAGED IN ENGLAND BY DELIVERING, SUPPORTING AND PROMOTING LITERACY INITIATIVES TO IMPROVE READING, WRITING, SPEAKING AND LISTENING SKILLS. THE ADVANCEMENT OF HEALTH FOR CHILDREN, FAMILIES, THE HOMELESS AND DISADVANTAGED IN ENGLAND THROUGH, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY, THE DELIVERY AND SUPPORT OF GREEN TRAVEL TO SCHOOL INITIATIVES, PROMOTION OF FOOD EDUCATION INITIATIVES, AND PROVISION OF LEISURE TIME ADRENALINE CHALLENGES. THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP AND COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT BY SUPPORTING SCHOOL COUNCILS, STUDENT GROUPS AND COMMUNITY ORGANISATIONS IN ENGLAND TO EMPOWER CHILDREN AND FAMILIES TO INFLUENCE COMMUNITY ISSUES, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY ON, HEALTH AND ROAD SAFETY ISSUES. THE PROMOTION OF ARTS AND SCIENCE TO SCHOOLS AND COMMUNITY GROUPS WITHIN ENGLAND TO RAISE AWARENESS OF THE IMPORTANCE OF THE SUBJECTS TO THE FAMILY, ECONOMY AND SOCIETY. THE PROMOTION OF ENVIRONMENTAL PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT TO SCHOOLS AND COMMUNITY GROUPS WITHIN ENGLAND THROUGH, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY ON, GREEN TRAVEL INITIATIVES, NATURE CONSERVATION, ENERGY CONSERVATION AND RECYCLING.
Area of benefit
KENT AND MEDWAY
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Estuary View
Boorman Way
Whitstable
KENT
CT5 3SE
- Phone:
- 08442640291
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window