Aden Association

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the benefit of the inhabitants of Sheffield and in particular those living in Brightside, Burngreave, Firvale and Firth Park by providing educational and recreational activities including vocational and non-vocational courses, summer playschemes, outdoor trips etc without distinction of age, disability, health status, religious or political affiliation, race, sexual orientation by worki
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
- Throughout London
- Somalia
- Syria
- Yemen
Governance
- 25 August 2004: Standard registration
- AL-KHAIR CENTRE (Working name)
- GOODWILL CENTRE (Working name)
- GOODWILL COMMUNITY CENTRE (Previous name)
- GOODWILL TRAINING AND INNOVATION CENTRE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Labeed Hussain | Trustee | 06 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gamal Suliman | Trustee | 07 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
OMER ABDULQADER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 April 2022 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 April 2021 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 JUNE 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 FEBRUARY 2007. as amended on 08 Dec 2019
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF SHEFFIELD AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE LIVING IN BRIGHTSIDE, BURNGREAVE, FIRVALE AND FIRTH PARK WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF AGE, DISABILITY, HEALTH, STATUS, RELIGIOUS OR POLITICAL AFFILIATION, RACE, SEXUAL ORIENTATION BY WORKING WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO RELIEVE POVERTY, ADVANCE EDUCATION, PROTECT HEALTH AND PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID RESIDENTS.
Area of benefit
THE INHABITANTS OF SHEFFIELD AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE LIVING IN BRIGHTSIDE, BURNGREAVE, FIRVALE AND FIRTH PARK
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 SHIREHALL CRESCENT
SHEFFIELD
S5 0GR
- Phone:
- 01142458363
- Email:
- PRINCEOMER@HOTMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window