ST MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Martin in the Fields Trust is raising money for the charitable and cultural work taking place across St Martin. We share ground, physically and philosophically, with the St Martin congregation, the St Martin cafe and live cultural events, The Connection at St Martin in the Fields and all the other organisations adding to the wider kindness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£2,372,995
Donations and legacies | £2.26m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £88.67k | |
Other | £26.46k |
Total expenditure:
£1,828,142
Raising funds | £647.97k | |
Charitable activities | £1.18m | |
Other | £0 |
£260,900 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £2,500 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £647.97k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.18m | |
Retained for future use | £544.85k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £647.97k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.18m | |
Retained for future use | £805.75k |
People

6 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 12 July 2005: Standard registration
- ST-MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS (Working name)
- CLEARROBIN LIMITED (Previous name)
- ST MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS DEVELOPMENT TRUST LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Malcolm James Butler | Chair | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ivan Yuen | Trustee | 07 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Melvene Adams | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Daniel Barker | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy John Beale | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Robin James Harjette | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
THE REVEREND DR SAMUEL MARTIN BAILEY WELLS | Trustee | 12 July 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £557.60k | £2.29m | £2.13m | £1.40m | £2.37m | |
|
Total expenditure | £852.70k | £2.22m | £2.11m | £1.21m | £1.83m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £2.50k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £500.00k | £2.25m | £2.09m | £1.37m | £2.26m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £57.60k | £42.47k | £42.82k | £23.34k | £88.67k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £188 | £4.09k | £26.46k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £35.22k | £171.34k | £216.08k | £36.49k | £30.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £517.43k | £1.79m | £1.74m | £713.06k | £1.18m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £335.27k | £435.59k | £370.55k | £496.10k | £647.97k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £517.43k | £1.79m | £1.74m | £713.06k | £1.18m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £12.25k | £12.48k | £13.25k | £13.55k | £13.03k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £0 | £0 | £0 | £2.75m | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £2.35m | £2.62m | £2.92m | £0 | £3.02m | |
|
Other assets | £2.52m | £2.31m | £2.20m | £2.24m | £2.69m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £538.02k | £452.27k | £307.36k | £288.25k | £211.57k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 19 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 22 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 22 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/12/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 17/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/02/2013 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/02/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED ARE: 1.1 THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY THE RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND BEAUTIFICATION OF THE CHURCH OF ST MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS (THE “CHURCH”) AND THE MONUMENTS, FITTINGS, FIXTURE, STAINED GLASS, FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS, BELLS, ORGANS AND ALL PROPERTY IN THE CHURCH AND SUCH OTHER BUILDINGS AS MAY BE USED FOR WORSHIP BY THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS, SO THAT THE CHURCH AND SUCH OTHER BUILDINGS CAN CONTINUE TO BE USED FOR RELIGIOUS WORSHIP; 1.2 TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES WORKING IN, OR ON BEHALF OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE PARISH OF ST MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS AND ITS SURROUNDING AREAS (“THE AREA OF BENEFIT”) AND TO PROMOTE THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES TO ACHIEVE CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT, THROUGH THE PROVISION, IMPROVEMENT, MAINTENANCE, REFURBISHMENT, OR ENHANCEMENT OF BUILDINGS AND SPACES DESIGNED TO MEET THE NEEDS OF THOSE CHARITIES OR THE DELIVERY OF CHARITABLE SERVICES PARTICULARLY THOSE SERVICES AIMED AT RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF HOMELESS PEOPLE OR THOSE AT RISK OF BEING HOMELESS; 1.3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PRIMARILY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COURSES, LECTURES AND OTHER EDUCATIONAL ACTIVITIES IN THE CHURCH; 1.4 THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND OTHER SUPPORT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL, DOMESTIC OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; AND 1.5 THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT GENERALLY.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF ST MARTIN-IN-THE-FIELDS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 ST MARTIN'S PLACE
LONDON
WC2N 4JH
- Phone:
- 02077661104
- Email:
- development@smitf.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window