Financial history NEW LIFE MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL (UK)

Charity number: 1105770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £19.75k £14.93k £21.40k £22.36k £26.34k
Total expenditure £15.63k £9.32k £17.84k £22.98k £25.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A