Accounts and annual returns HASTINGS AND AREA COMMUNITY TRANSPORT SERVICES

Charity number: 1105687
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 21 July 2010 171 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 26 May 2010 115 days late
Annual return 31 March 2008 11 February 2009 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 27 January 2009 On Time