Financial history Forum CIO

Charity number: 1107013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £570.48k £811.77k £1.43m £1.36m £1.81m
Total expenditure £557.47k £769.27k £1.05m £1.22m £1.81m
Income from government contracts £67.89k £95.73k N/A £223.65k N/A
Income from government grants £65.00k N/A £205.59k £360.73k £218.52k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £590.75k £811.77k £1.43m £1.36m £1.80m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £407 £974 £2.35k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £557.47k £769.27k £1.05m £1.22m £1.81m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £18.43k £16.18k £30.78k £102.93k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0