THE DAISY GARLAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Daisy Garland exists to support children and young adults with drug-resistant epilepsy and their families. The work of the charity is life-changing and life-saving.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
38 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 01 November 2004: Standard registration
- 09 August 2022: Funds received from 1058958 F.A.B.L.E (FOR A BETTER LIFE WITH EPILEPSY)
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID PATRICK GARLAND | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Dr Sarah Barker | Trustee | 25 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Bernard George Garland | Trustee | 01 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kim Byford | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Cole | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Gloria Dennison | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jayne Whiteley | Trustee | 25 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
TRACY LINDA MCLEAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £415.02k | £314.05k | £326.58k | £288.26k | £420.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £380.17k | £137.30k | £224.02k | £410.95k | £286.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 23 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 23 AUGUST 2004 AS AMENDED 8 OCTOBER 2004 as amended on 06 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
1. THE PROMOTION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH FOR CHILDREN AND ADULTS WITH DIFFICULT TO CONTROL EPILEPSY ACCOMPANIED BY DEVELOPMENTAL DELAY. 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY OFFERING SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO INDIVIDUALS WITH EPILEPSY. 3. TO RELIEVE SUCH CHILDREN AND ADULTS BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Units A1 and A2
Dart Marine Park
Steamer Quay Road
Totnes
Devon
TQ9 5AL
- Phone:
- 01803847999
- Email:
- info@thedaisygarland.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window