Accounts and annual returns LIKEWISE CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES

Charity Number: 1106317
Charity reporting is overdue by 50 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 50 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 50 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 11 June 2024 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 11 June 2024 72 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 30 May 2023 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 30 May 2023 60 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 31 May 2022 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 31 May 2022 61 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 03 June 2021 64 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 03 June 2021 64 days late Download Open in new window