LIKEWISE CHRISTIAN MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our charity has the community as its main focus and mostly interacts with technocrats, as to identify the major needs to be attended (body, soul & spirit), ideally likewise services are rendered to children, teenagers, men, women and the general public alike. Occassionally likewise arranges dinners, sport, concerts, tours, training programmes, counselling and special seminars so as to keep the com
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
- Throughout London
Governance
- 14 October 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YVONNE ARTHUR-PETERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PASTOR COFIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
WILLIAM KESSE NKANSAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD OPPONG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BEATRICE COFIE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.62k | £71.40k | £61.24k | £78.63k | £88.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £62.65k | £54.36k | £41.49k | £39.68k | £53.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 38 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 11 June 2024 | 72 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 30 May 2023 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 30 May 2023 | 60 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 31 May 2022 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 31 May 2022 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 03 June 2021 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 03 June 2021 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/05/2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/03/2011
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREIN CALLED "THE TRUSTEES") MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLES BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE INCLUDING BY MEANS OF ESTABLISHING AND OPERATING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR ESTABLISHMENTS IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (D) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
IN LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE DIRECTORS OF THE CHARITY (HEREIN CALLED "THE TRUSTEES") MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT;
Contact information
- Address:
-
363 Dagenham Road
Rush Green
Romford
RM7 0XX
- Phone:
- 02089849720
- Email:
- admin@likewiseministries.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window