THE INDEPENDENT FILM TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The IFT acts to advance the cause of independent filmmaking, for instance by encouraging emerging talent through the provision of training scholarships, and by helping the disadvantaged through training in various aspects of filmmaking.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £20,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 06 September 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elliot Grove | Chair | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £76.57k | £95.24k | £256.30k | £238.21k | £57.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.50k | £85.02k | £266.46k | £214.08k | £73.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £8.85k | £8.85k | £8.50k | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £56.23k | £209.94k | £216.97k | £20.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 13 November 2024 | 106 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 13 November 2024 | 106 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 31 July 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 31 July 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 21 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE CINEMATOGRAPHIC ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROMOTE ORIGINAL AND CREATIVE WORK OF CULTURAL MERIT IN THE FIELD OF FILM PRODUCTION IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
International House
6th Floor
6 Canterbury Crescent
London
SW9 7QE
- Phone:
- 07812007093
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window