INET TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
iNet-Trust was set up in August 2004 by a group of churches as an independent charity to enable them to operate a fully church-based missions programme, preparing people for overseas and cross-cultural mission work, to offer support in prayer, through finances, pastorally and strategically for cross-cultural workers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 August 2004: Standard registration
- 02 July 2024: Funds received from 1103389 BROCKLEY COMMUNITY CHURCH
- INET (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL JAMES PIPER | Chair |
|
||||||
Nicola Mary Harris | Trustee | 25 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Verena Foster | Trustee | 03 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alison Allen | Trustee | 04 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr STEPHEN FRANCIS NASH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £74.78k | £106.82k | £98.49k | £83.65k | £106.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £70.85k | £100.51k | £74.21k | £85.09k | £98.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 15 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 15 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 22 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 11 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 11 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 19 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 23 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS") SHALL BE 3.1 TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGHOUT THE WORLD GENERALLY INCLUDING BY THE WORSHIP OF GOD, THE INSTRUCTION AND EDIFICATION OF CHRISTIANS, THE CARE AND CHRISTIAN INSTRUCTION OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND CHILDREN AND THE EVANGELISATION OF NON-CHRISTIANS 3.2 TO RELIEVE POVERTY, HARDSHIP, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG ALL PEOPLES OF THE WORLD 3.3 TO PROMOTE EDUCATION AND TRAINING 3.4 TO SUPPORT SUCH OTHER CHARITIES AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
HERE FOR GOOD - COMMUNITY CENTRE
17 SYDENHAM ROAD
LONDON
SE26 5EX
- Phone:
- 07709 245381
- Email:
- admin@inet-trust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window