SANDYMOUNT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain and upkeep the Jewish section of Sandymount cemetery, and also including the seven Jewish sections, in total, in other cemeteries managed by Glasgow City Council.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnet
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 November 2004: Standard registration
- SANDYMOUNT REGENERATION PROJECT (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STANLEY CECIL COORSH | Chair | 12 March 2004 |
|
|
||||
Leonie Caroline Judith Lebens | Trustee | 24 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor ALAN SHENKIN | Trustee | 01 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Danielle Coorsh | Trustee | 01 February 2013 |
|
|||||
MICHAEL STEPHEN COORSH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.15k | £4.00k | £24.66k | £1.34k | £30 | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.74k | £2.46k | £25.30k | £2.66k | £1.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £8.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 16 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 23 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25/08/2004 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 30/09/2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 08/01/2013
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN THE UPKEEP OF SANDYMOUNT CEMETERY, GLASGOW
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 10
Cranmer Court
Wickliffe Avenue
London
N3 3HG
- Phone:
- 02083460936
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window