INTERLINK PARADISE FOUNDATION INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND FOR PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM SEVERE DISEASES AND MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS AND THEIR FAMILIES, BOTH WITHIN THE UNITED KNIDOM AND OVERSEAS, BY THE PROVISION OF FINANACIAL AND PASTORIAL SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGHOUT THE WORLD.3. ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION & TRAINING. AREA OF BENEFIT: UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Afghanistan
- Akrotiri
- Albania
- Algeria
- American Samoa
- Andorra
- Angola
- Antarctica
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Australia
- Austria
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belarus
- Benin
- Bermuda
- Brazil
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Central African Republic
- Chad
- China
- Dhekelia
- Egypt
- Ethiopia
- Ghana
- Haiti
- India
- Kenya
- Liberia
- Libya
- Mauritius
- Nigeria
- Rwanda
- Somalia
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Uganda
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 25 November 2004: Standard registration
- PARADISE OF TRUST MINISTRIES (Previous name)
- PARADISE OF TRUTH MINISTRIES (Previous name)
- PARADISE OF TRUTH MINISTRIES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ADESOLA ALO | Chair | 28 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
EMMANUEL TEMITAYO ALO | Trustee | 15 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
ARAMIDE ESTHER OLUWAFUNMILAYO ALO | Trustee | 31 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.44k | £955 | £812 | £600 | £5.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.51k | £905 | £865 | £650 | £6.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 March 2022 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 02/06/2003 AS AMENDED ON 22/10/2004 AS AMENDED ON 05/11/2010
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND FOR THOSE SUFFERING FROM LEPROSY, AIDS, CANCER AND TUBERCULOSIS AND THEIR FAMILIES, BOTH WITHIN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS, BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL AND PASTORAL SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE. 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION THROUGHOUT THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
NITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Upper Road
LONDON
E13 0DH
- Phone:
- 07946499467
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window