THE BRADFORD BULLS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Heritage Activities Photographs Oral History Web Site Schools Community Groups Video/DVD/Film Archive Community Sports Coaches Initiatives Reduction of Childhood Obesity Coaching and Sports Camps
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £25,752 from 3 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Bradford City
Governance
- 04 November 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher William Frederick Mason | Chair | 13 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Philip Matthew Sharp | Trustee | 16 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Timothy James BARNETT | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Boluaji Akinbosola FAGBORUN | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Elphick | Trustee | 26 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Paul READYHOUGH | Trustee | 04 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Susan CATER | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.14k | £125.15k | £265.45k | £311.45k | £280.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £152.17k | £136.53k | £248.10k | £303.29k | £302.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £44.42k | £52.55k | £8.10k | £25.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 June 2023 | 139 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 26 FEBRUARY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 28 OCTOBER 2004
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: TO FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PEOPLE (IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO ARE OR MAY BE DISADVANTAGED OF EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS AND/OR THOSE COMPRISED IN AN ETHNIC MINORITY) AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE FOREGOING BY: 1. PROMOTING THEIR PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY ORGANISING OR ASSISTING IN THE ORGANISATION OF, EQUIPPING, EDUCATING AND INSTRUCTING IN AND PROVIDING FACILITIES PROMOTING THE PLAYING OF RUGBY LEAGUE FOOTBALL AND SUCH OTHER GAMES OR SPORTS AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME; 2. PROTECTING AND PRESERVING THE HEALTH OF SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE IN SUCH CHARITABLE WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT; 3. PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF COURSES, LECTURES, DEMONSTRATION AND COACHING FOR THEIR TEACHERS WHO ORGANISE OR SUPERVISE PLAYING OR COACHING RUGBY LEAGUE FOOTBALL AND SUCH OTHER GAMES OR SPORTS AT SUCH EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DETERMINE FROM TIME TO TIME; 4. PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF COURSES, LECTURES, DEMONSTRATIONS AND COACHING PROMOTING PHYSICAL HEALTH AND FITNESS, ANTI-DRUGS AWARENESS, ANTI-BULLYING AND HEALTHY LIFESTYLE MESSAGES FOR SUCH YOUNG PEOPLE; 5. PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF COURSES, LECTURES AND DEMONSTRATIONS WHICH AIM TO REDUCE CRIME AND TRUANCY AMONGST YOUNG PEOPLE AND TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH PERSONS AND THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE; 6. ORGANISING AND/OR PROVIDING AND/OR ASSISTING IN THE ORGANISATION AND EDUCATION IN AND/OR THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITIES FOR THOSE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; AND 7. ADVANCING PUBLIC EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL LITERATURE TO EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENTS WITH THE AIM TO ADDRESS YOUNG PEOPLE'S PERSONAL AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT BY PROMOTING THEIR PERSONAL, MENTAL AND SOCIAL WELL-BEING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE THE UNITED KINGDOM OF GREAT BRITAIN AND NORTHERN IRELAND, EIRE, AUSTRALIA AND NEW ZEALAND.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Bradford Bulls Foundation
Odsal Stadium
Rooley Avenue
BRADFORD
BD6 1BS
- Phone:
- 08448711490
- Email:
- info@bullsfoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window