KIDS FIRST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A small School of Conductive Education in Essex, which provides and offers facilities to create an enviroment that allows children with Cerebral Palsy together with their carers / family to improve their quality of life. This is done by helping them to access Conductive Education, equipment as well as necessary support and information.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 23 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHELLE LONE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JON GRIMBLE | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
KIM GRIMBLE | Trustee | 15 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
GARY O'DONNELL | Trustee | 30 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE STONE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KATE O'DONNELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER LONE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CAROLE DAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 23/06/2020 | 23/06/2021 | 23/06/2022 | 23/06/2023 | 23/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.66k | £17.24k | £1.34m | £45.75k | £48.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.56k | £31.87k | £45.69k | £46.00k | £36.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £1.30m | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £3.62k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £34.35k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £38.89k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £4.30k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £1.80k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £4.30k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £2.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 23 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 June 2024 | 22 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 23 June 2023 | 09 July 2024 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 June 2023 | 11 July 2024 | 79 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 23 June 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 June 2022 | 21 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 23 June 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 June 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
A. THE SCHOOL WILL BE ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES ONLY IN THE TRAINING OF ALL CHILDREN WITH CEREBRAL PALSY IN CONDUCTIVE EDUCATION (AS ESTABLISHED WITHIN THE PETO INSTITUTE, HUNGARY) IN THE AGE GROUP OF 0 TO 11 YEARS. B. TO PROVIDE EQUIPMENT, APPARATUS AND THERAPEUTIC MOTIVATORS AS REQUIRED FOR CONDUCTIVE EDUCATION FOR CHILDREN SUFFERING FROM ANY FORM OF CEREBRAL PALSY. C. TO INTERACT AND OFFER/ACCEPT ADVICE FROM LOCAL OR CENTRAL AUTHORITIES. D. TO OFFER FACILITIES AND CREATE AN ENVIRONMENT THAT ALLOWS PARENTS/CARERS THE OPPORTUNITY TO SHARE THEIR EXPERIENCES AND KNOWLEDGE THAT WILL ALLOW THEM TO ACCESS THE OTHER AMENITIES THAT WILL ASSIST IN THE WELFARE OF THE CHILDREN TOWARDS A BETTER QUALITY OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
45B Lampits Hill
Corringham
Stanford Le Hope
SS17 9AA
- Phone:
- 01375641024
- Email:
- kids-first@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window