Financial history STAFFORDSHIRE SEARCH AND RESCUE TEAM

Charity number: 1105836
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £35.80k £41.92k £23.90k £35.34k £37.96k
Total expenditure £35.45k £42.23k £28.41k £20.09k £34.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £15.25k N/A N/A N/A