KESWICK AND DISTRICT BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist/educate our members in the best possible practice in the craft of beekeeping. To keep members up to date with new procedures, and to encourage them to take basic beekeeping exams. To educate the public and provide facilities for this in the form of an Association Apiary. To give demonstrations to shool groups, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
Governance
- 06 September 2004: Standard registration
- KESWICK BEEKEEPERS (Working name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Barnes | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leslie William Nicholson | Trustee | 09 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
STANLEY EDMONSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SANDRA NOREEN WALLACE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £942 | £1.06k | £2.71k | £1.82k | £4.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £812 | £1.12k | £1.90k | £1.33k | £1.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 February 2025 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 February 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 February 2021 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE WITHIN KESWICK AND DISTRICT THE EDUCATION OF ITS MEMBERS POTENTIAL MEMBERS AND THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE CRAFT OF BEEKEEPING.
Area of benefit
KESWICK AND DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 St. Johns Terrace
Ambleside Road
Keswick
CA12 4DP
- Phone:
- 01768773108
- Email:
- lwnicholson@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window