CANTILENA SINGERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The choir performs a range of different songs which it performs to various groups in the local community. It does not audition for entry and the choir works hard to achieve a high standard for performance. Our two main concerts - at Christmas and in the Summer - usually raise significant sums for 3 local charities each year. As a result of the pandemic, no concerts were held in 2020 and 2021.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
- Surrey
Governance
- 14 September 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARILYN PATRICIA AITKEN | Chair | 14 September 2004 |
|
|
||||
Christine Fensom | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Barker | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JILL KILSBY M.A. M.B.A | Trustee | 14 September 2004 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/04/2020 | 01/04/2021 | 01/04/2022 | 01/04/2023 | 01/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.80k | £1.43k | £1.92k | £4.13k | £5.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.44k | £347 | £2.96k | £5.20k | £5.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 April 2024 | 01 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2023 | 05 April 2024 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2022 | 09 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2021 | 16 March 2022 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 April 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 16 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN, AND APPRECIATION OF, THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC APPROPRIATE TO A LADIES' CHOIR IN ALL ITS ASPECTS INCLUDING THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS AND FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 PURLEY OAKS ROAD
SOUTH CROYDON
CR2 0NP
- Phone:
- 02086602924
- Email:
- jkcharity@outlook.com
- Website:
-
cantilenasingerscroydon.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window