PAKISTAN COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The management committee provide this state-of-the-art community resource to promote the physical, social, cultural and economic betterment of local community. Activities provided particularly for ladies and elderly to promote social inclusion. Venue available for hire for social and cultural events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

19 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Reading
- Wokingham
Governance
- 23 September 2004: Standard registration
- 22 July 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 August 2009: Standard registration
- PCC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
19 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kamal Ahmed Saleem | Chair | 09 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Azam Janjua | Trustee | 31 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Mehmuda Khatoon Abdulla | Trustee | 09 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Raheela Iqbal | Trustee | 09 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tanveer Bhatti | Trustee | 09 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Muhammad Iftikhar | Trustee | 09 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Fuad Waheed | Trustee | 09 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
EJAZ ELAHI | Trustee | 09 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
ASGHAR KHAN | Trustee | 09 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Imran Ghafoor | Trustee | 09 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Alif Din | Trustee | 09 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Chaudhry Waseem | Trustee | 09 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
BARKAT ALI | Trustee | 09 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Rizwana Bhatti | Trustee | 09 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Zeeshan Sheikh | Trustee | 09 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
CLLR TONY JONES | Trustee | 08 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
AMJAD TARAR | Trustee | 08 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
GUL FARAZ KHAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Mian Saleem | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.97k | £32.58k | £4.13k | £27.90k | £5.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.29k | £37.38k | £5.85k | £4.54k | £5.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £9.50k | £14.40k | N/A | £12.25k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2024 | 371 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 February 2024 | 371 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 December 2022 | 309 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 May 2022 | 476 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 May 2022 | 476 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 AUGUST 2003 as amended on 16 May 2020
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE MEMBERS OF THE PAKISTANI COMMUNITY IN READING OF THE EFFECTS OF POVERTY TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF READING IN THE HISTORY, PHILOSOPHY, MUSIC, LANGUAGES, LITERATURE AND CULTURE OF PAKISTAN. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF MEMBERS OF THE PAKISTANI COMMUNITY IN READING IN THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE, LITERATURE, HISTORY, ART, MUSIC AND CULTURE TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THE RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF READING, AND IN PARTICULAR MEMBERS OF THE PAKISTAN COMMUNITY IN READING, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
READING
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 BRIGHTON ROAD
READING
RG6 1PS
- Phone:
- 01189269031
- Email:
- kmlslm@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window