Accounts and annual returns ERIMUS HOUSING LIMITED

Charity number: 1106102
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

12 January 2018 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 30 September 2016 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2015 07 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 01 October 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2014 12 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 02 October 2014 On Time