Financial history ERIMUS HOUSING LIMITED

Charity number: 1106102
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016
Total gross income £43.94m £48.79m £52.66m £54.52m £53.48m
Total expenditure £37.13m £40.79m £39.77m £40.82m £39.11m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £1.02m £982.62k
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £2.92m £599.02k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £43.94m £48.79m £52.66m £54.52m £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £53.48m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £37.13m £40.79m £39.77m £40.82m £39.11m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0