TULIP FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the relieve of poverty abd sickness, advance education and protest, preserve health, particularly with the disadvantage young vulnerable adult both local, national and international. To promote other charitable purpose as may arise from time to time as determined. To promote the benfit of the people and the neighbourhood togather confined by resident without distinction.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 April 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Kent
- Surrey
- Throughout London
- Cuba
- Dominican Republic
- Haiti
- Nigeria
- United States
Governance
- 08 September 2004: Standard registration
- 05 December 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CMIS HOUSING AND SUPPORT SERVICES (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/04/2011 | 04/04/2012 | 04/04/2013 | 04/04/2014 | 04/04/2015 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 04 April 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 04 April 2016 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 APRIL 2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION UPON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11 MAY 2006
Charitable objects
1. PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE PEOPLE OF THURROCK, AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD TOGETHER CONFINED BY RESIDENCE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT")WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE SUPPORT SERVICES THAT WILL IMPROVE ACCESS TO HOUSING AND BY COMMUNITY INTERVENTION DESIGNED TO REDUCE EXCLUSION FROM HOUSING AND ALL OTHER RELATION ISSUES, TO ASCERTAIN RESOURCES ARE USED CONSTRUCTIVELY, FAIRLY AND EFFECTIVELY TO REDUCE CRIME AND REPAIRS THE FABRIC OF SOCIETY, TO ENHANCED EDUCATION, TRAINING AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS MOST LIKELY TO REDUCE CRIME AND ANY FURTHER OFFENDING REPAIR RELATIONSHIPS AND ENCOURAGE RE-INTEGRATION. 2. TO PROMOTE THE RELIEVE OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROTECT, PRESERVE HEALTH, PARTICULARLY, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, OF THE DISADVANTAGE YOUNG VULNERABLE ADULT THAT INCLUDES THE HOMELESS, REFUGEES, ISOLATION OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCE OR AS A RESULT OF LOCAL, NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL DISASTER AND PROBLEMS. 3. PROMOTE OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
THURROCK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window