Accounts and annual returns INDIA ENVIRONMENT TRUST
Charity number: 1106942
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 26 January 2009 | 361 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | 25 March 2008 | 54 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 11 May 2007 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | 11 May 2007 | 100 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 17 February 2006 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 17 February 2006 | 17 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window