DISCOVERING LATIN AMERICA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Discovering Latin America's mission is to improve the lives of disadvantaged people in Latin America by sharing its culture, art and creativity with the world. We envision a better and more unified region free of poverty, illiteracy, sickness, distress. We have organised unique fundraising events on the following areas: Anthropology, Dance, History, Film, Gastronomy, Music, Theatre and Visual Arts
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
People

3 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Argentina
- Belize
- Bolivia
- Brazil
- Chile
- Colombia
- Costa Rica
- Cuba
- Dominican Republic
- Ecuador
- El Salvador
- French Guiana
- Guatemala
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Honduras
- Mexico
- Nicaragua
- Panama
- Peru
- Suriname
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Uruguay
- Venezuela
Governance
- 11 November 2004: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MAURICIO DAVILA | Chair |
|
|
|||||
SYLVIA VILLA-ECHEVERRIA | Trustee | 03 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
NATALY LORENTZ | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £27.58k | £24.07k | £10.33k | £0 | £13 | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.86k | £21.60k | £12.97k | £4.71k | £570 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 821 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 821 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1186 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1186 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1551 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1551 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 15 AUGUST 2004, AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 19 OCTOBER 2004
Charitable objects
1 THE EDUCATION OF PUBLIC ABOUT THE COUNTRIES OF LATIN AMERICA, THEIR PEOPLE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, CULTURE, MUSIC FOLKLORE AND THE INTELLECTUAL, ARTISTIC AND ECONOMIC LIFE OF THOSE COUNTRIES. 2 THE IMPROVEMENT OF EDUCATION IN THE COUNTRIES OF LATIN AMERICA AND ELSEWHERE. 3 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN THE COUNTRIES OF LATIN AMERICA AND ELSEWHERE. 4 SUCH OTHER GENERAL PURPOSES, IN LATIN AMERICA AND THE UK, AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
LATIN AMERICA AND UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Ashmore Close
London
SE15 5GY
- Phone:
- 02073583817
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window