LITTLE FOXES WILD ORPHAN CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Little Foxes continues to provide the best care we can for all the sick, injured and orphaned wildlife that comes our way. We have updated and improved our outside runs and hope to be able in due course to purchase a small piece of land for our own use. We are looking at ways to increase our income in these costly times
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 24 September 2004: Standard registration
- LITTLE FOXES (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PENNY LITTLE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MRS BEA BRADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUDY GILBERT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.77k | £12.29k | £15.59k | £7.47k | £7.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.84k | £16.62k | £19.38k | £11.73k | £24.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 12 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF WILD ANIMALS IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION AND IN PARTICULAR, TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION, CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH ANIMALS. TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS WILD ANIMALS BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR WILD ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF BEING ORPHANED OR SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PARTICULARLY TO ANIMAL WELFARE IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG WILD ANIMALS. TO PROVIDE THROUGH EXPERTISE AND FACILITIES, THE REHABILITATION OF RESCUED ANIMALS BACK TO THE WILD WHEN THEIR CARE AND TREATMENT IS CONCLUDED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
COBB HALL COTTAGE
RECTORY ROAD
GREAT HASELEY
OXFORD
OX44 7JS
- Phone:
- 01844279469
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window