SHREWSBURY YOUTH FOR CHRIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are an independent, self-financing and cross-denominational Christian (Secondary & FE Colleges) Schools Worker Project. We deliver assemblies and PSHE and RE lessons and run after school clubs and mentoring sessions in the Shrewsbury area. We support Christian Union groups and organise town wide events for young Christians - Taking the Good News relevantly to the young people of Shrewsbury.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Shropshire
Governance
- 28 October 2004: Standard registration
- SHREWSBURY YFC (Working name)
- SYFC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTIN ANSTEY WITHINGTON | Chair | 12 October 2011 |
|
|
||||||
Kath Day | Trustee | 07 July 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Greg Smith | Trustee | 17 September 2023 |
|
|||||||
Roy Haworth | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||
JOYCE MARY HAYWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
FI IDDON | Trustee |
|
||||||||
PAUL JAMES KELLY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
EMMA BROOMFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
Dr SARA SHORT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.32k | £63.82k | £59.73k | £58.36k | £44.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.58k | £53.22k | £64.87k | £58.20k | £42.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JULY 2004
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO PROCLAIM THE GOSPEL OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN SHREWSBURY AND ITS ENVIRONS; (B) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE CHRISTIAN EVANGELISATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN SHREWSBURY AND ITS ENVIRONS; (C) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE POSITIVE CHRISTIAN LIVING.
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR IN SHREWSBURY AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ILLUMINATE
18 WYLE COP
SHREWSBURY
SY1 1XB
- Phone:
- 01743270537
- Email:
- ellie@s-yfc.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window