TRADING VISIONS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Trading Visions is a charity working to alleviate the poverty of small-scale producers in the developing world by amplifying their voices to challenge and change industry practice. A new strand of our education work focuses on using webcasts and video conferencing to scale up face-to-face contact between young consumers in the UK and Fairtrade cocoa farmers and their communities in Ghana.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ghana
Governance
- 06 October 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JONATHAN ANDREW SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
KIKA ANNA WILLIAMSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SOPHI TRANCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £52.43k | £49.36k | £36.03k | £37.99k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.20k | £37.86k | £39.42k | £36.25k | £9.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 302 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 302 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 668 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 668 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 01 September 2022 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 August 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 15 August 2021 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 JUNE 2003
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE UK AND OVERSEAS ABOUT THE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC INJUSTICES FACED BY SMALL SCALE PRODUCERS IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES WITH A FOCUS ON FAIR-TRADE (AS DEFINED IN THE ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION) AND FAIRER TERMS OF TRADE, THEREBY RELIEVING POVERTY, BY IN PARTICULAR 3.1 UNDERTAKING RESEARCH AND CASE STUDIES (AND DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH) TO ILLUMINATE THE THEORY AND PRACTICE OF ALTERNATIVE TRADING METHODS WHICH AIM TO ALLEVIATE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC INJUSTICES FACED BY SMALL SCALE PRODUCERS IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES; AND 3.2 FACILITATING DISCUSSION AND ACTING AS A CATALYST FOR POLICY AND PRACTICE REVIEW AMONGST PUBLIC AND PRIVATE SECTOR ENTITIES (BUT NOT SO AS TO ENGAGE IN PARTY POLITICAL CAMPAIGNING).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 HORSELYDOWN LANE
LONDON
SE1 2LN
- Phone:
- 02073578367
- Email:
- info@tradingvisions.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window