CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH OF GOD MISSION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To develop an assembly of true believers committed to demonstrating true christian love to the hurting, discouraged, oppressed and frustrated. To empower them and influence their family, the world in worship and in truth to the glory of God. The mission statement is also to lead people to the Lord, strengthen fellowship in His family and equip members to develop Christ-like character and impact
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 September 2004: Standard registration
- CHRIST APOSTOLIC CHURCH OF GOD MISSION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev CHRISTOPHER OSAGBAEKHOE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
AYO TAIWO OSAGBAEKHOE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 November 2023 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 November 2021 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 MARCH 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, BY TEACHING CHRISTIANS TRUTH, AND SUCH OTHER MEANS AS THE TRUSTEE SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT, INCLUDING THE EMPERMENT OF THE COMMUNITY THROUGH EDUCATION, THE PROVISSION OF CHILD CARE, AN THE ERADICATION OF POVERTY IN THE UK AND AROUND THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 TEASEL CRESCENT
LONDON
SE28 0LP
- Phone:
- 02088543303
- Email:
- cacgm@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window