THE MUSIC WORKS (CHARITY)

Charity number: 1106979
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To advance the education of the public, in the making of music and related activities particularly children and young people.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 November 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • FDMM (Previous name)
  • FOREST OF DEAN MUSIC MAKERS (Previous name)
  • GLOUCESTERSHIRE MUSIC MAKERS (Previous name)
  • MUSIC MAKERS (Previous name)
  • THE MUSIC WORKS (Previous name)
  • THE MUSIC WORKS (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Maheen Rasul Trustee 25 March 2024
None on record
Gemma Cropper Trustee 11 December 2023
None on record
Rupert Walters Trustee 26 September 2022
None on record
Benjamin Daniel Conie Trustee 23 May 2022
None on record
Natalie Sodzi Trustee 25 March 2021
None on record
Stuart Leslie Cairns Trustee 19 November 2018
None on record
VERSHA CARTER Trustee 10 July 2017
KRISHAN ANAND HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
KRISHAN ANAND CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Alexander Ross Trustee 27 November 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £632.10k £1.69m £1.66m £1.68m £2.45m
Total expenditure £603.10k £767.81k £1.33m £1.56m £1.89m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £41.07k N/A £199.25k
Income from government grants £303.18k £59.40k £58.55k £262.90k £240.52k
Income - Donations and legacies £484.46k £1.55m £93.56k £48.58k £130.75k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £630.89k
Income - Charitable activities £147.33k £131.81k £1.33m £1.60m £1.68m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £310 £93 £35 £2.25k £6.51k
Income - Other £0 £0 £244.17k £21.41k £0
Income - Legacies £0 £97.60k £0 £48.58k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £577.11k £748.33k £1.29m £1.51m £1.82m
Expenditure - Raising funds £25.99k £19.48k £37.91k £44.61k £61.00k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £6.47k £8.52k £11.04k £8.52k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £39.58k £902.09k £1.05m £913.53k £1.32m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £611.82k £725.30k £888.74k £1.18m £1.41m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £18.50k £75.64k £52.09k £91.49k £161.29k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 26 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 14 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 12 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 06 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Kings House
27 St. Aldate Street
Gloucester
GL1 1RP
Phone:
07904052268