Accounts and annual returns PRIDE (SOUTH EAST)

Charity Number: 1105892
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2011 Not submitted
Annual return 31 October 2010 18 January 2012 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2010 18 January 2012 140 days late