PROSPER MENTAL HEALTH FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes support and encourage mental health for all ages. Promote the efficiency and effectiveness of charities working with or on behalf of people with mental health problems. Promote research into all aspects and treatment of all forms of mental illness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Afghanistan
- Australia
- Hungary
- Romania
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 November 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COUNTESS ILONA ESTERHAZY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Alan Howard Felt | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Eamonn Antoine Townsend | Trustee | 19 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
RODNEY BAILEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2019 | 30/10/2020 | 30/10/2021 | 30/10/2022 | 30/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.06k | £723 | £937 | £4.39k | £1.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.24k | £1.24k | £662 | £488 | £678 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2023 | 28 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | 14 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2021 | 06 September 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2020 | 06 September 2021 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2019 | 30 September 2020 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 APRIL 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 4 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
(A) FOR THE PROMOTION, PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD MENTAL HEALTH, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, ADVICE AND GUIDANCE TO CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS PROVIDING CARE, TREATMENT OR REHABILITATION SERVICES OF ANY TYPE FOR THOSE SUFFERING FROM OR WHO ARE RECOVERING FROM MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS; (B) TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES WORKING WITH OR ON BEHALF OF PEOPLE WITH MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS AND THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFECTIVE USE OF RESOURCES FOR THOSE CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, BY PROVIDING MANAGEMENT ADMINISTRATIVE, STRATEGIC AND OTHER SERVICES AND SUPPORT (INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF SHARING KNOWLEDGE AND BEST PRACTICE). (C) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL ASPECTS OF THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF ALL FORMS OF MENTAL ILLNESS (IN PARTICULAR METHODS FOR PREVENTING MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS).
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 130
HENLEY-ON-THAMES
OXFORDSHIRE
RG9 5YU
- Phone:
- 01491641435
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window