Financial history GIVING WORLD

Charity number: 1105883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £459.66k £396.13k £239.05k £179.45k £170.51k
Total expenditure £366.26k £323.81k £263.19k £210.22k £225.41k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A