MPIKA VILLAGE OF HOPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE PROVIDE A LOVING, CARING HOME FOR ORPHANED CHILDREN.WE TEACH THE CHILDREN TO SHARE & HELP THE COMMUNITY.WE DEVELOPED TWO FARMS TO ENSURE A STABLE FOOD SUPPLY AND BUILT A SCHOOL TO PROVIDE EDUCATION .WE PROVIDE CLEAN WATER & MEDICAL CARE.WE DO OUTREACH WORK. WE PROVIDE AFFORDABLE CLOTHING, AND HOUSEHOLD GOODS TO THOSE IN NEED IN BRADFORD AREA. WE RECYCLE AS MUCH AS POSSIBLE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
- Zambia
Governance
- 18 November 2004: Standard registration
- MPIKA RELIEF FUND (Working name)
- MPIKA RELIEF FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Crowther | Chair | 22 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Rose Bower | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN NEWHAM | Trustee | 21 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ANNE WATKIN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99.47k | £93.91k | £139.54k | £142.47k | £121.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.98k | £73.46k | £93.95k | £124.51k | £118.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £39.14k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 09 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 21 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 29 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 12 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
05 April 2020
(These accounts |
07 April 2021 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2 SEPTEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 31 OCTOBER 2004 AS AMENDED 16 APRIL 2016
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO ARE DESTITUTE OR ORPHANED BY AIDS BY THE PROVISION AND ONGOING MAINTENANCE OF AN ORPHANAGE IN MPIKA, ZAMBIA. 2. THE RELIEF OF SUFFERING OF PEOPLE, THEIR FAMILIES OR DEPENDANTS WHO ARE LIVING WITH OR ARE AFFECTED BY AIDS. 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC INTO THE CAUSES, TREATMENTS, WAYS OF COPING WITH AND PREVENTION OF AIDS/HIV IN DEVELOPING COUNTRIES.
Area of benefit
MPIKA, ZAMBIA AND DEVELOPING COUNTRIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 16
Black Dyke Mills
Brighouse Rd
Queensbury
Bradford
- Phone:
- 01274 945670
- Email:
- MPIKARELIEF@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window