LINK AGE SOUTHWARK

Charity number: 1105923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Link Age Southwark provides friendly volunteer support to older people. We help people stay connected with their communities, alleviate loneliness and improve wellbeing through: one-to-one befriending; activity groups with volunteer transport; practical support including light gardening and help with odd jobs; intergenerational work with local schools; specialist services for people with dementia.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Lambeth
  • Lewisham
  • Southwark

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 September 2004: Standard registration
  • 14 March 2013: Funds received from 1087666 SOUTHWARK CHURCHES CARE
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • DULWICH HELPLINE (Previous name)
  • DULWICH HELPLINE AND SOUTHWARK CHURCHES CARE (DH&SCC) (Previous name)
  • DULWICH HELPLINE AND SOUTHWARKCHURCHES CARE (DH&SCC) (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Barbara Fittall Trustee 18 March 2025
None on record
Dr Ruth Evans Trustee 28 September 2023
None on record
Yoko De Souza Trustee 06 October 2022
None on record
John Baldwin Trustee 06 October 2022
None on record
Valerie Strachan Trustee 06 October 2022
None on record
Kieran Payne Trustee 06 October 2022
None on record
Zoe Bond Trustee 06 October 2022
None on record
CAROLINE SARAH OLDFIELD HAVERS Trustee 17 September 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DULWICH, ST BARNABAS
Received: On time
Dr Rebecca Torry Trustee 16 January 2017
THE LOUISE TEBBOTH FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Adrian Greenwood Trustee 02 October 2012
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF ST. JAMES WITH CHRISTCHURCH AND ST. CRISPIN, BERMONDSEY
Received: On time
THE INASMUCH TRUST
Received: On time
THE SOUTH LONDON CHURCH FUND AND SOUTHWARK DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £559.84k £557.65k £694.76k £543.47k £1.09m
Total expenditure £525.89k £558.32k £586.68k £649.95k £662.68k
Income from government contracts N/A £136.09k £138.66k N/A £120.86k
Income from government grants £123.25k £33.11k N/A £56.69k £20.81k
Income - Donations and legacies £374.02k £92.54k £505.75k £363.02k £916.25k
Income - Other trading activities £59.93k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £123.25k £192.24k £188.13k £176.74k £162.47k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.64k £2.35k £872 £3.71k £13.39k
Income - Other £0 £290.52k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £5.00k £10.00k £0 £0 £532.49k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £502.19k £538.56k £563.20k £627.26k £638.70k
Expenditure - Raising funds £23.70k £19.76k £23.48k £22.69k £23.98k
Expenditure - Governance £28.97k £19.76k £10.24k £11.95k £19.57k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £81.65k £77.33k £68.97k £59.33k £48.15k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £360.99k £388.99k £499.59k £408.53k £888.66k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £25.05k £29.41k £23.56k £29.35k £68.86k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 13 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 13 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 17 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 25 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 04 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
URC
Tell Grove
LONDON
SE22 8RH
Phone:
02082992623