SIDMOUTH LIFEBOAT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of emergency lifeboat rescue service approved by the Marine and Coastguard Agency
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
58 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Devon
Governance
- 16 September 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP JAMES SHEPPERD | Chair | 06 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Kitrina Campbell Bishop | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Michael Hedger | Trustee | 26 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
NAOMI COOK | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JOHN DEAN | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAN James FLETCHER | Trustee | 22 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Christine Frances YOUNG | Trustee | 16 March 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £319.29k | £133.95k | £497.05k | £829.18k | £326.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £229.67k | £184.97k | £227.10k | £265.36k | £270.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £745.60k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £37.06k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £46.52k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £672.32k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £236.02k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £29.34k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £31.92k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 02 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 AUGUST 2004
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION OF LIFE AND IMPROVEMENT IN THE STANDARD OF INSHORE SEA AND COASTLINE SAFETY IN THE AREA AGREED WITH HER MAJESTY'S COASTGUARD BY SIDMOUTH LIFEBOAT AS A DECLARED RESCUE FACILITY.
Area of benefit
SIDMOUTH, DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sidmouth Lifeboat
The Lifeboat Station
The Esplanade
SIDMOUTH
EX10 8BE
- Phone:
- 07394268693
- Website:
-
sidmouthlifeboat.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window