MUCH MARCLE SCHOOL PTA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
raise funds for the children of Much Marcle Primary School to be spent on the children or the schoool, or items for the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 16 September 2004: Standard registration
- 23 October 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- MUCH MARCLE PTA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/08/2012 | 31/08/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.31k | £3.35k | £3.56k | £2.74k | £2.58k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.61k | £3.63k | £1.45k | £4.66k | £190 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2013 | 23 June 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2012 | 21 March 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY: (1) DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; (2) ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window