THE ROWNTREE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the education of the general public and inhabitants of and visitors to York in the contribution of the Rowntree Family and in particular Joseph & Seebohm Rowntree in their philanthropic work to York, the surrounding area and society in general by providing guided tours, publishing literature and by any other means which the Trustees think fit which are charitable at law.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 September 2004: Standard registration
- 02 April 2024: Funds received from 1186395 THE NEW EARSWICK LOCAL HISTORY SOCIETY
- ROWNTREE WALKS (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH STEWART GRIERSON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Eleanor Rhodes | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Andrea Grant | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Louise Gray | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alison Margaret Sayers | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tina Caroline Walker | Trustee | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Richard Jagger | Trustee | 29 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANETTE RAY | Trustee | 24 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Edward Pittam | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £158.99k | £6.82k | £419 | £229.55k | £12.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £48.46k | £43.24k | £42.92k | £70.19k | £60.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 November 2024 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 24 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 14 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 AUGUST 2004
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN GENERAL AND THE INHABITANTS OF AND VISITORS TO YORK IN PARTICULAR IN THE CONTRIBUTION OF THE ROWNTREE FAMILY GENERALLY AND IN PARTICULAR JOSEPH AND SEEBOHM ROWNTREE IN THEIR PHILANTHROPIC WORK TO YORK THE SURROUNDING AREA AND SOCIETY IN GENERAL BY THE PROVISION OF GUIDED TOURS THE PUBLICATION OF LITERATURE AND BY ANY OTHER MEANS WHICH THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT WHICH ARE CHARITABLE AT LAW
Area of benefit
YORK
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLEMENTS HALL
NUNTHORPE ROAD
YORK
YO23 1BW
- Phone:
- 01904543384
- Email:
- info@rowntreesociety.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window