Financial history FAMILY MEDIATION WORCESTERSHIRE LIMITED

Charity number: 1106756
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010
Total gross income £198.84k £228.74k £222.40k £165.47k £174.15k
Total expenditure £230.26k £211.91k £182.60k £171.43k £182.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A