Financial history THE GRANDPARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1105977
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 30/09/2016
Total gross income £299.21k £327.03k £321.20k £303.05k £114.95k
Total expenditure £331.70k £303.95k £277.85k £261.09k £271.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £89.27k £0