THE FRIENDS OF NENE VALLEY PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We fund raise for the school by holding coffee afternoons, school discos, easter egg hunts, fetes, quiz nights and car boot sales.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 24 September 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Camila Moura Dantas Carrera | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Scothern | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hollie Sinfield | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/04/2020 | 06/04/2021 | 06/04/2022 | 06/04/2023 | 06/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.44k | £5.09k | £6.45k | £8.21k | £15.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.03k | £5.19k | £3.51k | £15.69k | £5.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 April 2024 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2023 | 17 October 2024 | 254 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2022 | 31 March 2023 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2021 | 04 March 2022 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 April 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 FEBRUARY 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL (NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY) AND AS AN ANCILLARY THERETO AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THIS OBJECT THE FRIENDS MAY: A. FOSTER MORE EXTENDED RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; AND B. ENGAGE IN ACTIVITIES THAT SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS ATTENDING IT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
NENE VALLEY PRIMARY SCHOOL
SUGAR WAY
PETERBOROUGH
PE2 9RT
- Phone:
- 01733897517
- Email:
- FONV@nenevalleyprimary.net
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window