THE ASHFORD SCHOOL ASSOCIATION CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial assistance to former Ashford School pupils - aged up to 22 years - to aid further/higher education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Kent
Governance
- 08 November 2004: Standard registration
- 11 May 2017: Removed (Funds transferred (s.74))
- 11 May 2017: Funds transferred to 1165474 THE ASHFORD SCHOOL FOUNDATION
- ASHFORD SCHOOL OLD GIRLS' ASSOCIATION CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2012 | 30/09/2013 | 30/09/2014 | 30/09/2015 | 30/09/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £440 | £412.90k | £14.79k | £20.02k | £16.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £278 | £381 | £3.41k | £11.99k | £476.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | 10 March 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | 02 March 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 11 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | 16 November 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | 24 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | 12 November 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | 15 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | 26 November 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 22 OCTOBER 2004 AND CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
(I) TO PROVIDE PUPILS AT ASHFORD SCHOOL WITH FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TOWARDS THE COAST OF THEIR SCHOOL FEES AND GENERAL EXPENSES INCURRED WHILE AT THAT SCHOOL; (II) TO ASSIST PUPILS ON LEAVING ASHFORD SCHOOL WITH FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE WHILE UNDERTAKING FULL TIME FURTHER EDUCATION OR TRAINING UP TO THE END OF THEIR TWENTY-SECOND YEARS OF AGE; AND (III) TO PROVIDE PRIZES TO PUPILS AT ASHFORD SCHOOL IN RECOGNITION OF THEIR ACADEMIC OR SPORTING ACHIEVEMENTS WHILE AT THAT SCHOOL OR OF THEIR CONTRIBUTIONS TO THE LIFE OF THAT SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window