FIRST STEP OPPORTUNITY GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
First Step provides support for families of children with special needs and/or disabilities and offers a range of services which support children to reach their individual potential, through developmental play and learning.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Havering
Governance
- 23 September 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROISIN McCORRY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Simon Richard Powell | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ian Malcolm Gorsuch | Trustee | 22 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Topps | Trustee | 26 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Martin Roger Flower Mr | Trustee | 11 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Gillian Webb | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
BRUCE MCLAREN ANDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £268.24k | £360.32k | £171.91k | £351.57k | £315.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £362.11k | £306.79k | £264.65k | £392.63k | £397.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £13.78k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £51.40k | £59.29k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 MAY 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE PRE-SCHOOL CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS, RESIDING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAVERING, AN OPPORTUNITY FOR EDUCATIONAL DEVELOPMENT INA CARING ENVIRONMENT THROUGH A WIDE RANGE OF PLAY ACTIVITIES AND EXPERIENCES AND TO OFFER FAMILIES OF SUCH CHILDREN SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND ADVICE, INA FRIENDLY ATMOSPHERE OF TRUST AND CONFIDENTIALITY.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
FIRST STEP
TANGMERE CRESCENT
HORNCHURCH
RM12 5PP
- Phone:
- 01708 556355
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window